Barton et al v. Constellium Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Barton, Neil Knox, Elijah P. Morris, Wayne Morris, John Tabor and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Defendant: Constellium Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC and Constellium Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC Employees Group Benefits Plan
Case Number: 2:2013cv03127
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting defendants' 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiffs' 94 SECOND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Liability; directing that this case is dismissed and stricken from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/4/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
August 12, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting fefendants' 44 MOTION to Defer Summary Judgment Ruling or, in the Alternative, for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; this matter is STAYED until further order of the court; the parties are directed to advise the court of any relevant ruling by Judge Copenhaver; the remaining dates in the Scheduling Order are VACATED; a new scheduling order will be issued at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/12/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
July 23, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendants' 52 MOTION to strike plaintiffs' jury demand. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/23/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
April 25, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff Class Representatives' 37 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Certification of Subclasses. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/25/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton et al v. Constellium Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Barton
Represented By: Pamina G. Ewing(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William T. Payne(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen M. Pincus(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bradley J. Pyles(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Knox
Represented By: Pamina G. Ewing(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William T. Payne(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen M. Pincus(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bradley J. Pyles(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah P. Morris
Represented By: Pamina G. Ewing(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William T. Payne(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen M. Pincus(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bradley J. Pyles(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Morris
Represented By: Pamina G. Ewing(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William T. Payne(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen M. Pincus(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bradley J. Pyles(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tabor
Represented By: Pamina G. Ewing(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William T. Payne(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen M. Pincus(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bradley J. Pyles(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Represented By: Bradley J. Pyles
Represented By: Joseph P. Stuligross(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellium Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellium Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC Employees Group Benefits Plan
Represented By: Christopher L. Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?