Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. Fola Coal Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy and Sierra Club
Defendant: Fola Coal Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv21588
Filed: August 8, 2013
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF staying its decision on a specific remedy and directing FOLA to submit, within fourteen days of the bench trial's conclusion, a proposed plan for collecting water flow and quality data for Road Fork and Cogar Hollow, as more fully set forth herein; directing the Parties to appear for periodic case management conferences; appointing Mr. James H. Kyles as Special Master of engineering. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/7/2016. (cc: attys, the Special Master, and any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
August 12, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding that Plaintiffs have established that the Defendant has committed at least one violation of its permits for Mine No. 2 and Mine No. 6 by discharging into Road Fork and Cogar Hollow high levels of ionic pollution, which have caused or materially contributed to a significant adverse impact to the chemical and biological components of the applicable streams aquatic ecosystem, in violation of the narrative water quality standards that are incorporated into those permits. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/12/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)
May 29, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Jurisdictional Issues as set forth more fully herein; denying Defendant's 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/29/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (tmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. Fola Coal Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Highlands Conservancy
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fola Coal Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?