Justice v. Mine Safety and Health Administration

Plaintiff: Marshall Justice
Defendant: Mine Safety and Health Administration
Case Number: 2:2014cv14438
Filed: April 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying Plaintiff's 45 PETITION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/31/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting Mine Safety and Health Administration's 30 motion for summary judgment insofar as Justice seeks disclosure of information in the inspector MOIs withheld under Exemption 5, as described more fully herein, an d denying plaintiff Marshall Justice's 34 motion for summary judgment to the same extent; MSHA's motion for summary judgment is granted insofar as Justice seeks disclosure of information in the inspector MOIs withheld by MSHA under Exemption 7(C), as discussed more fully herein, and Justice's motion for summary judgment is denied to the same extent. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/29/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying the plaintiff's 33 MOTION to amend the complaint; holding in abeyance the plaintiff's 34 MOTION for summary judgment with respect to the Memorandums of Interviews of the MSHA inspectors, but other wise denying said motion; granting the defendant's 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to those documents already disclosed and those withheld documents that are not subject to dispute, but held in abeyance as to the MOIs of the MSHA inspectors; MSHA is directed to review, in light of the foregoing discussion, the MOIs of the MSHA inspectors to determine whether any portions of those records are segregable and disclosable; and MSHA is directed to confer with Justice w ithin 20 days of the entry of this order respecting the MOIs of the MSHA inspectors; to the extent there remains disagreement as to the disclosure of those documents, MSHA is directed to submit the MOIs of the MSHA inspectors to the court by 8/31/2015 for in camera review. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/31/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying as premature the Mine Safety and Health Administration's 9 MOTION to dismiss Count II of the complaint. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/23/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. Mine Safety and Health Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Justice
Represented By: Daniel F. Hedges 1
Represented By: Samuel Brown Petsonk
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety and Health Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?