Greene v. Ballard et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jermaine Greene
Defendant: David Ballard, Jonathan Frame, Margaret Clifford, Andy Mitchell and Sherriel L. Snider
Case Number: 2:2017cv02897
Filed: February 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Dwane L. Tinsley
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER The 252 Proposed Findings and Recommendation is adopted and incorporated herein; the 209 MOTION by Michael Jermaine Greene for Court Order to Have Defendant Move Back to Mt. Olive Correctional Complex for MHU Only is denied. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 2/25/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties; United States Magistrate Judge) (kew)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court overrules plaintiff's 208 objections; adopts and incorporates in full the 197 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley; denies in part, without prejudice, and grants in part, defendants' 141 Motion to Dismiss as more fully set forth herein. This case is again referred to United States Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for additional proceedings. Signed by Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/27/2020. (cc: counsel of record, any unrepresented parties, and the United States Magistrate Judge) (arb)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing (1) That the petitioner's objection to the Proposed Findings and Recommendation is overruled; (2) That the magistrate judge's 137 Proposed Findings and Recommendation are adopted and incorporated in full; (3) That the plaintiff's 47 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Protective Order and his 118 Motion Requesting an Order to be Moved from Mount Olive Correctional Complex if New Offer of Settlement is Refused are denied; (4) That the defendants' 34 motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice, pending a new responsive pleading by those defendants in view of the addition of fifty more defendants in the Second Amended Complaint; and (5) That this matter is again referre d to the United States Magistrate Judge for additional consideration of the plaintiff's claims for relief contained in the Second Amended Complaint, on which this matter will now proceed. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties; United States Magistrate Judge) (kew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Ballard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jermaine Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherriel L. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?