Stoler v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica A. Stoler
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00988
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part as more fully set forth herein defendant's 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/11/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to Dismiss; directing that defendant's motion to dismiss is denied with respect to plaintiff's WVCCPA claims (Count I); and defendant's motion to dismiss is granted with respect to plaintiff's negligence claim (Count II), tortious interference with contract claim (Count III), and estoppel claim (Count IV). Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 2/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 MOTION by Jessica A. Stoler to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County; pursuant to this court's 15 order of 7/20/2018, staying the briefing on the pending motion to dismiss, that briefing is no longer stayed, and PennyMac has until 12/20/2018 to file its reply in support of its 4 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoler v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica A. Stoler
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?