Cantrell v. Frame et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Cantrell
Defendant: John Frame, Scott Smith, Richard Toney, Andrew Hill, Sgt. Mike Buzzard and Ryan Hill
Case Number: 2:2018cv01106
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Fayette
0 Judge: John T Copenhaver
1 Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 21 REPLY by Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney to #18 Brief In Opposition. (Mullins, Michael)
August 29, 2018 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Ryan Hill, re: #2 Complaint. Ryan Hill served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. Person Served: Ryan Hill. (taq)
August 29, 2018 19 DECLARATION by Larry Wayne Cantrell in opposition to #11 MOTION by Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (taq)
August 29, 2018 18 BRIEF by Larry Wayne Cantrell in opposition to #11 MOTION by Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (taq)
August 24, 2018 17 DECLARATION by Larry Wayne Cantrell in support of #15 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel. (taq)
August 24, 2018 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Larry Wayne Cantrell in support of #15 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel. (taq)
August 24, 2018 15 MOTION by Larry Wayne Cantrell for the Appointment of Counsel. (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
August 23, 2018 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Scott Smith, re: #2 Complaint. Scott Smith served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Person Served: Captain Daniel James. (taq)
August 23, 2018 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Mike Buzzard, re: #2 Complaint. Mike Buzzard served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Person Served: Sandra M. Swisher. (taq)
August 22, 2018 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney in support of #11 MOTION by Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney to Dismiss #2 Complaint (Parsons, Colton)
August 22, 2018 11 MOTION by Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (Parsons, Colton)
August 15, 2018 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Andrew Hill, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Hill served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Person Served: William Meadows. (taq)
August 15, 2018 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Richard Toney, re: #2 Complaint. Richard Toney served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Person Served: William Meadows. (taq)
August 15, 2018 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon John Frame, re: #2 Complaint. John Frame served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Person Served: William Meadows. (taq)
July 23, 2018 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Larry Wayne Cantrell for John Frame, Richard Toney, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Sgt. Mike Buzzard, Scott Smith, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy for each defendant delivered to United States Marshals Service for service. (Attachments: #1 USM Form 285 as to John Frame, #2 USM Form 285 as to Richard Toney, #3 USM Form 285 as to Andrew Hill, #4 USM Form 285 as to Ryan Hill, #5 USM Form 285 as to Mike Buzzard, #6 USM Form 285 as to Scott Smith) (taq)
July 19, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER no initial partial filing fee is imposed; the plaintiff is required to make monthly payments; granting the plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, except to the extent that the plaintiff is required to make the payments as directed and set forth more fully herein; notice to the plaintiff herein and to notify the court within 30 days if he does not wish to prosecute this civil action; the Clerk is directed to issue a summons for each named defendant; the United States Marshals Service to serve each summons and a copy of the Complaint on the defendants or their agents for service of process, pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); the period for service provided in Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to run from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 7/19/2018. (cc: plaintiff; inmate accounts, Mount Olive Correctional Complex) (taq)
July 5, 2018 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
July 2, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 2, 2018 4 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES FROM TRUST ACCOUNT by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (taq)
July 2, 2018 3 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (Attachment: #1 Resident Transaction Details) (taq)
July 2, 2018 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Cover Letter and Envelope) (taq)
July 2, 2018 1 APPLICATION by Larry Wayne Cantrell to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Frame et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Frame
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Toney
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hill
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Mike Buzzard
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hill
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?