United States of America v. One 2009 Chevrolet Silverado 1500

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2009 Chevrolet Silverado 1500
Interested Party: Leonard S. Roberts, II
Case Number: 2:2018cv01194
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 9 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE with Jury Demand by Leonard S. Roberts, II. (Collias, Gary)
September 6, 2018 7 CLAIM to Defendant Property of Leonard S. Roberts II (Collias, Gary)
September 5, 2018 8 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM and VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE returned executed. Served One 2009 Chevrolet Silverado 1500, VIN: 3GCEC230X9G237804 on 8/15/2018. (taq)
August 3, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Warrant of Arres t. and Notice in Rem. (Arthur, Christopher)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER directing that Gary A. Collias, CJA Panel Attorney, is appointed to represent the defendant and interested party in the instant matter. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/1/2018. (cc: defendant/interested party and counsel; United States Attorney; United States Probation Office; CJA Supervising Attorney; United States Marshal) (taq)
July 30, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
July 30, 2018 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
July 30, 2018 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (taq)
July 30, 2018 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (taq)
July 30, 2018 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE by United States of America against One 2009 Chevrolet Silverado 1500. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2009 Chevrolet Silverado 1500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2009 Chevrolet Silverado 1500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Leonard S. Roberts, II
Represented By: Gary A. Collias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?