The Town of Clendenin, West Virginia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Plaintiff: The Town of Clendenin, West Virginia
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Cardinal Health, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., SpecGx LLC, Noramco, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01284
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 7 CONFIRMATION from Northern District of Ohio that the case has been opened in that district as 1:18-op-46127, filed 10/05/2018. (kp)
October 4, 2018 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-57) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 10/04/2018. (cc: attys) (kp)
October 4, 2018 5 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-57), MDL 2804. (ts)
September 10, 2018 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
September 10, 2018 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Amerisource, #2 Summons issued as to Cardinal Health, #3 Summons issued as to CVS, #4 Summons issued as to Omnicare, #5 Summons issued as to McKesson, #6 Summons issued as to Wal-Mart East, #7 Summons issued as to Miami-Luken, #8 Summons issued as to Kroger Limited, #9 Summons issued as to Harvard Drug Group, #10 Summons issued as to Walgreen East, #11 Summons issued as to Anda, Inc., #12 Summons issued as to Anda Pharmaceuticals, #13 Summons issued as to Rite-Aid, #14 Summons issued as to KeySource, #15 Summons issued as to Masters Pharmaceuticals) (lca)
September 10, 2018 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by The Town of Clendenin, West Virginia for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to Amerisource, #2 Summons submitted as to Cardinal, #3 Summons submitted as to CVS, #4 Summons submitted as to Omnicare, #5 Summons submitted as to McKesson, #6 Summons submitted as to Wal-Mart East, #7 Summons submitted as to Miami-Luken, #8 Summons submitted as to Kroger Limited, #9 Summons submitted as to Harvard Drug Group, #10 Summons submitted as to Walgreen Eastern, #11 Summons submitted as to Anda, Inc., #12 Summons submitted as to Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #13 Summons submitted as to Rite-Aid, #14 Summons submitted as to Keysource Medical, #15 Summons submitted as to Masters Pharmaceuticals) (lca)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6792397. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Town of Clendenin, West Virginia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Clendenin, West Virginia
Represented By: John David Hurst
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?