Robertson, Inc. et al v. McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC
Plaintiff: Robertson, Inc. and The Baughan Group
Defendant: McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01326
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Robertson, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Burns, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/5/2018 as to McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC; with Disclosure. (taq)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Robertson, Inc. (Attachment: #1Exhibit A)(Burns, Daniel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (ts)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 27, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Robertson, Inc., The Baughan Group for McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC re: #1 Complaint. (ts)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO COLLECT TRADE DEBT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6824407. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson, Inc. et al v. McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robertson, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns
Represented By: Colleen C. McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Baughan Group
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns
Represented By: Colleen C. McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoy Elkhorn Coal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?