United States of America v. The Sum of $14,225.76 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Sum of $14,225.76 in United States Currency
Interested Party: Michael Allen Parker
Case Number: 2:2018cv01372
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem. (Arthur, Christopher)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is hereby REASSIGNED from Judge Joseph R. Goodwin to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 10/25/2018. (cc: Judge Goodwin; Judge Copenhaver; counsel of record; any unrepresented party). (klc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (taq)
October 22, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (taq)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by United States of America against The Sum of $14,225.76 in United States Currency. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Sum of $14,225.76 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sum of $14,225.76 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Allen Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?