Riling et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Andrew G. Riling, A. P. Riling and Beverly Riling
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. and Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01390
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
1 Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION set for 1/31/2019 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ts)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT by Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Andrew G. Riling, Beverly Riling, A. P. Riling. (Markins, Michael) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add party filers) (kp).
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR MCKESSON CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT by A. P. Riling, Andrew G. Riling, Beverly Riling, McKesson Corporation. (Mullins, Katherine) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add party filer) (kp).
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/9/2018 as to McKesson Corporation. (taq)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/9/2018 as to Purdue Pharma L.P. (taq)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/9/2018 as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC. (taq)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons issued as to McKesson Corporation, #4 Summons issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #5 Summons issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #6 Summons issued as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #7 Summons issued as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 Summons issued as to Mallinckrodt PLC, #9 Summons issued as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC) (taq)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) (Modified on 11/2/2018 to refer case to Judge Aboulhosn)(ts).
October 29, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Andrew G. Riling, Beverly Riling, A. P. Riling, for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons submitted as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons submitted as to McKesson Corporation, #4 Summons submitted as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #5 Summons submitted as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #6 Summons submitted as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #7 Summons submitted as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 Summons as to Mallinckrodt PLC, #9 Summons as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC) (taq)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6903737. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riling et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew G. Riling
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P. Riling
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Riling
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Katherine M. Mullins
Represented By: Russell D. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?