United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC v. Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC
Defendant: Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01414
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 THIS MEMBER CIVIL ACTION HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:18-cv-01404 AS OF 11/26/2018; CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:18-cv-01404 HAS BEEN DESIGNATED AS THE LEAD ACTION. ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS SHALL PROCEED UNDER THAT STYLING AND DOCKETED THEREIN. (taq)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER pursuant to a telephonic status conference on 11/20/2018; directing the two actions consolidated; Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-01404 to be designated as the lead case, and the matter to proceed under that styling; preliminary injunction hearing set for 11/26/2018 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 23, 2018 Filing 12 EXHIBITS by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC in support of #11 Response In Opposition,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Robidoux, Kaitlin)
November 23, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE BRIEF by Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC in opposition to #1 MOTION by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC for Preliminary Injunction (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Robidoux, Kaitlin) (Modified on 11/26/2018 to remove link to #5 brief) (kp).
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC (Robidoux, Kaitlin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/20/2018; (slw)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER telephonic status conference set for 11/20/2018 at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/18/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC. Summons served on Derek Scantlin/Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Maroney, Thomas) (Modified on 11/16/2018 to add answer date) (kp).
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Maneesh Sharma on behalf of United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC. Local counsel: Thomas P. Maroney. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6947881. (Maroney, Thomas)
November 7, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC in support of #1 MOTION by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC for Preliminary Injunction (Maroney, Thomas)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC, re: #1 Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC for Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC, re: #1 complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (kp)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6940742. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit K, #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC v. Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Slaughter
Represented By: Kaitlin L. H. Robidoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Maroney
Represented By: Maneesh Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?