Lloyd v. Mount Olive Correctional Complex Staff
Plaintiff: Billy Lloyd
Defendant: Mount Olive Correctional Complex Staff
Case Number: 2:2018cv01429
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER to Billy Lloyd, from Rory L. Perry II dated 11/27/2018, re: #4 letter regarding status of case. (brn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from Billy Lloyd dated 11/19/2018, re: status of case. (kp)
November 15, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (ts)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Billy Lloyd, from Clerk, U. S. District Court, Southern District of West Virginia dated 11/15/2018, re: 1983 Forms, with request to complete and return them within 10 days. (slr)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT by Billy Lloyd. (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Mount Olive Correctional Complex Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Olive Correctional Complex Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?