Branham v. Berlin Packaging, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Donna G. Branham
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Berlin Packaging, LLC and Michelle Clapham
3Rd Party Defendant: Scottie Via
Case Number: 2:2018cv01454
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Scottie Via. Scottie Via served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Summons served on Scottie Via. (Subacz, Allison)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Berlin Packaging, LLC (Subacz, Allison)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottie Via, re: #4 Third Party Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Berlin Packaging, LLC against Scottie Via. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(Subacz, Allison)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berlin Packaging, LLC, Michelle Clapham. (Subacz, Allison) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 16, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michelle Clapham, Berlin Packaging, LLC, with amended complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6961830. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branham v. Berlin Packaging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Berlin Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Michelle Clapham
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna G. Branham
Represented By: Eric J. Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scottie Via
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?