Young v. State Farm Insurance Companies
Plaintiff: Michael L. Young
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01469
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE granting #1 Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint; directing that the parties shall conform to the following initial schedule: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/4/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/11/2019. Scheduling/status conference at 10:00 AM on 4/1/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 1/10/2019. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record) (kp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Michael L. Young in opposition to Affirmative Defenses, re: #9 Answer to Second Amended Complaint. (taq)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Michael L. Young for Leave to File #6 Second Amended Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Weber, Constance)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Michael L. Young in opposition to #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP. (ts)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Michael L. Young to Affirmative Defenses re: #3 Answer to Complaint. (ts)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michael L. Young amending the complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, Part 1, #2 Exhibits, Part 2 (Document Set 2), #3 Civil Case Information Statement, #4 Certified Mail, Return Receipt) (filed stamped with the Circuit Court of Kanawha County on 11/29/2018) (taq)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michael L. Young amending the complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (filed stamped with the Circuit Court of Kanawha County on 11/28/2018) (taq)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies (Weber, Constance)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Insurance Companies. (Weber, Constance)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 27, 2018 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Insurance Companies with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6973236. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. State Farm Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies
Represented By: Constance H. Weber
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Constance H. Weber
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?