Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 v. Mid South Carbon Corporation

Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016
Defendant: Mid South Carbon Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01497
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 to #12 Response In Opposition. (Hulett, Eric) (Modified on 2/4/2019 to remove link to #11 motion) (kp).
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Mid South Carbon Corporation opposing #11 MOTION by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 for Leave to File Surresponse (Hall, Lee)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 for Leave to File Surresponse (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Hulett, Eric)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Reply Brief. ERROR: Image did contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Signature obtained and image replaced. (kp)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF by Mid South Carbon Corporation to #8 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hall, Lee) (Modified on 1/23/2019 to remove link to #7 motion and replace image to correct counsel's signature) (kp).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/6/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/18/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/25/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM on 3/1/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 in opposition to #7 MOTION by Mid South Carbon Corporation to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Hulett, Eric)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Mid South Carbon Corporation to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (Hall, Lee)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/12/2018 as to Mid South Carbon Corporation. (kp)
December 7, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mid South Carbon Corporation, re: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (taq)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016. (taq)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 for Mid South Carbon Corporation, re: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (taq)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6988949. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016 v. Mid South Carbon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B0621ECOGLXS0016
Represented By: Eric Jett Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid South Carbon Corporation
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Represented By: Jason David Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?