Rich v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Rich
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc. and Fairmont Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2018cv01541
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 CONFIRMATION from Northern District of West Virginia that the case has been opened in that district as 1:19-cv-00021, filed 2/12/2019. (slr)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the #17 MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer; the court TRANSFERS this action the Clarksburg Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/12/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party; Clerk, United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia) (taq)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 2/25/2019 is cancelled; directing this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 7/1/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/17/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/15/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/31/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery by 8/14/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 9/3/2019, with responses due by 9/17/2019, and replies due by 9/24/2019. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Settlement Meeting and mediation deadline by 11/4/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 11/12/2019, with responses due by 11/18/2019. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 11/8/2019, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2019 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Proposed jury instructions due by 12/9/2019. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 12/16/2019 in Charleston. Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 8:30 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc., Fairmont Federal Credit Union, Tyler Rich. (Martin, Adam) (Modified on 1/30/2019 to add party filers) (kp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FAIRMONT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION'S #16 CROSS-CLAIMS to 2/18/2019 by FCA US LLC, Fairmont Federal Credit Union, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER Order of Court by Fairmont Federal Credit Union (Bryson, Colby)
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Fairmont Federal Credit Union in support of #17 MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division (Bryson, Colby)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Fairmont Federal Credit Union to Transfer from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division (Bryson, Colby)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fairmont Federal Credit Union and CROSSCLAIM by Fairmont Federal Credit Union against FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1. ERROR: Image did not contain appropriate signature for counsel. CORRECTION: Signature corrected and image replaced. (kp)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC for Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions. (Martin, Adam)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Fairmont Federal Credit Union (Smallwood, Edward) (Modified on 1/9/2019 to correct signature and replace image) (kp).
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by Fairmont Federal Credit Union (Bryson, Colby)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Fairmont Federal Credit Union and CROSSCLAIM by Fairmont Federal Credit Union against FCA US LLC, Urse Dodge, Inc. (Bryson, Colby)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adam W. Martin on behalf of Urse Dodge, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Colby S. Bryson on behalf of Fairmont Federal Credit Union. (Bryson, Colby) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to obtain correct form and replace image) (kp).
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of Fairmont Federal Credit Union. (Smallwood, Edward) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to obtain correct form and replace image) (kp).
January 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 and #7 Appearance of Counsel. ERROR: Incorrect forms used. CORRECTION: Forms corrected and images replaced. (kp)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/4/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/11/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m. on 2/25/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant FCA US LLC (Martin, Adam)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. (Martin, Adam)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC with summons, amended complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7006079. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)
December 26, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Adam W. Martin
Represented By: James M. Popson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urse Dodge, Inc.
Represented By: Adam W. Martin
Represented By: James M. Popson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmont Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Represented By: Colby S. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Rich
Represented By: David L. Grubb
Represented By: Kristina Thomas Whiteaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?