Ramey et al v. Coloplast Corp.

Plaintiff: William L. Ramey and Martha Jane Mitchell Ramey
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00034
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 CASE CLOSED pursuant to the #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. (mms)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Coloplast Corp., Martha Jane Mitchell Ramey, William L. Ramey. (Varney, Lana) (Modified on 2/19/2019 to add party filer) (lca).
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 147 (Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 7 Cases) entered on 12/11/2018 in MDL 2387 to attorneys in member case. (mms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coloplast Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7020534. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey et al v. Coloplast Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Ramey
Represented By: Adam David Breit
Represented By: Cam F. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Jane Mitchell Ramey
Represented By: Adam David Breit
Represented By: Cam F. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Represented By: Lana K. Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?