Morris v. Mingo County Board of Education

Plaintiff: Jeannine A. Morris
Defendant: Mingo County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Clerk, Circuit Court of Mingo County, West Virginia, of receipt of case file pursuant to the #9 agreed order remanding this civil action. (taq)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER to Clerk, Circuit Court of Mingo County, West Virginia, from Clerk, USDC/SDWV, dated 3/4/2019, re: submitting case file pursuant to the court's agreed order entered 3/4/2019 remanding this case. (taq)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER granting #8 MOTION by Mingo County Board of Education to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal; REMANDS this case to the Circuit Court of Mingo County, West Virginia; and further DIRECTS the Clerk to remove this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Mingo County Board of Education to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruggier, Duane) (Modified on 2/25/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Duane J. Ruggier II, Drannon L. Adkins substituting Drannon L. Adkins in the place and stead of Evan S. Olds on behalf of Mingo County Board of Education (Ruggier, Duane)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Jeannine A. Morris to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County (Bika, Letisha)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Mingo County Board of Education. (Ruggier, Duane) (Modified on 1/25/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kp).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/11/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/28/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 3/8/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/14/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/22/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Mingo County Board of Education. Mingo County Board of Education served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. Summons served on Sabrina Grace, President. (Bika, Letisha)
January 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mingo County Board of Education with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7024272. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet (State Court)) (taq) (Additional attachment received and added on 1/15/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Mingo County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine A. Morris
Represented By: Letisha R. Bika
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mingo County Board of Education
Represented By: Evan Shawn Olds
Represented By: Duane J. Ruggier, II
Represented By: Drannon L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?