Lambert v. Ames

Petitioner: Ronald E. Lambert, Jr.
Respondent: Donald F. Ames
Case Number: 2:2019cv00053
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $5, Receipt Number CHAR015423. (tmr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION UNDER 28 USC 2254 FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Ronald E. Lambert, Jr. to Attorney General and Respondent with copy to Petitioner. (taq)
January 17, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Ronald E. Lambert, Jr. against Donald F. Ames pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2254. (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope) (taq)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Ronald E. Lambert, Jr. to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (Attachment: #1 Resident Transaction Details) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert v. Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald E. Lambert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald F. Ames
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Viglianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?