Jordan v. South Central Regional Jail
Plaintiff: John Wesley Jordan, III
Defendant: South Central Regional Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv00057
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by John Wesley Jordan, III. (Attachments #1 Resident Balance Statement) (taq)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (taq)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by John Wesley Jordan, III to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (taq)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to John Wesley Jordan, III, from Rory L. Perry II dated 1/24/2019, re: #1 letter-form complaint. (brn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 22, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. South Central Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wesley Jordan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?