Hutchinson v. United Dairy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jayson Hutchinson
Defendant: United Dairy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00060
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying as moot the #5 and #7 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kp)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: the scheduling conference is cancelled; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 5/30/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 8/13/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 7/29/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 8/28/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/13/2019. Discovery to close by 9/27/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 10/17/2019, Responses due by 10/31/2019, and Replies due by 11/7/2019. Settlement Meeting to be held by 12/18/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/27/2019, with responses due by 1/3/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 12/23/2019, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 12/30/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 1/29/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 2/3/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL the parties have agreed to a protocol governing the taking of depositions in this case; directing as more fully set forth that the following protocol shall be followed with all depositions conducted herein. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kp)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(d) pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) and the agreement of the parties, directing that the following procedures herein shall govern the inadvertent production of privileged or confidential documents. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(b) consistent with Federal Rule of Evidence 502(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(b), directing that the following procedures herein shall govern the inadvertent production of privileged or confidential documents. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S NEGLIGENCE AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS re: #7 MOTION by United Dairy, Inc. to Dismiss Negligence Claim re: Complaint by Jayson Hutchinson, United Dairy, Inc. (Duffield, R.) (Modified on 3/6/2019 to add party filer) (kp).
March 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting. ERROR: Image did not contain signatures. CORRECTION: Signatures added and image replaced. (kp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d) by Jayson Hutchinson (Duffield, R.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(b) by Jayson Hutchinson (Duffield, R.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER Order Setting Deposition Protocol by Jayson Hutchinson (Duffield, R.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Jayson Hutchinson, United Dairy, Inc. (Duffield, R.) (Modified on 3/5/2019 to add signatures, replace image and add party filer) (kp).
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by United Dairy, Inc. in support of #7 MOTION by United Dairy, Inc. to Dismiss Negligence Claim re: Complaint. (Cook, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by United Dairy, Inc. to Dismiss Negligence Claim re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Cook, David) (Modified on 2/20/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by United Dairy, Inc. in support of #5 MOTION by United Dairy, Inc. to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claim re: Complaint. (Cook, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by United Dairy, Inc. to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claim re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Cook, David) (Modified on 2/20/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kp).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/19/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/28/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/7/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:30 AM on 3/15/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/22/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kp)
January 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Dairy, Inc., with Jury Demand. (taq)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Dairy, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7036047. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. United Dairy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Dairy, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: R. Chad Duffield
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?