Marrujo et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roberto Marrujo and Socorro Marrujo
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation and Coloplast Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00061
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 01/29/2019. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Strongman, Jon)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 200 (Order Appointing Lynn Baker as Settlement Master for Private Settlement Agreement Between BSC and Certain Plaintiffs' Counsel) entered on 11/14/2018 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (mms)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, Coloplast Corp., re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kab)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7036360. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrujo et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Marrujo
Represented By: David A. Kaufman
Represented By: Hamilton E. Arendsen
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Bumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Marrujo
Represented By: David A. Kaufman
Represented By: Hamilton E. Arendsen
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Bumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?