SuperValu Holdings, Inc. v. Tate et al

Petitioner: SuperValu Holdings, Inc.
Respondent: Donald L. Tate and John W. Fitzwater
Case Number: 2:2019cv00085
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arnold John Janicker on behalf of SuperValu Holdings, Inc. (Janicker, Arnold)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to the #9 Suggestion of Bankruptcy; this civil action is STAYED with respect to John W. Fitzwater pending the outcome of his bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY UPON THE RECORD as to John W. Fitzwater by John W. Fitzwater (Attachment: #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing)(Thompson, Stephen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Donald L. Tate. Donald L. Tate served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Summons served on Donald L. Tate. (Janicker, Arnold)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Petitioner SuperValu Holdings, Inc. (Turner, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for John W. Fitzwater. John W. Fitzwater served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. Summons served on John W. Fitzwater. (Turner, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald L. Tate, John W. Fitzwater, re: #1 Petition and Motion. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons issued as to John W. Fitzwater) (taq)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 4, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by SuperValu Holdings, Inc. for Donald L. Tate, John W. Fitzwater, re: #1 Petition and Motion. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons submitted as to John W. Fitzwater) (taq)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by SuperValu Holdings, Inc. in support of #1 Petition and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. (taq)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7049671. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration, #2 Exhibits A-E, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SuperValu Holdings, Inc. v. Tate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald L. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Fitzwater
Represented By: Stephen L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SuperValu Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Arnold John Janicker
Represented By: Steven P. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?