Chastain et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Richard Chastain and Kristen Chastain
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00090
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Form 1A) by Boston Scientific Corporation for Boston Scientific Corporation, with proposed WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FORM (Form 1B). (Strongman, Jon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 202 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 6 Cases) entered on 02/04/2019 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (mms)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (brn)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7052057. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (brn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chastain et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chastain
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Sr.
Represented By: Robin M. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Chastain
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Sr.
Represented By: Robin M. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?