M. et al v. Wood County Schools
Plaintiff: M. A. and C. M.
Defendant: Wood County Schools
Case Number: 2:2019cv00108
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION by M. A. to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Meade, James)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION by M. A. to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Meade, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #5 Counterclaim by M. A., C. M. (Meade, James) (Modified on 3/21/2019 to add party filer) (kp).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/15/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/22/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:30 p.m. on 4/26/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 5/1/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Petition for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Wood County Schools and COUNTERCLAIM by Wood County Schools against M. A., C. M. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (Boothby, Richard)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wood County Schools, re: #1 Petition. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (taq)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by C. M., M. A. for Wood County Schools, re: #1 Petition. (taq)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7070504. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. et al v. Wood County Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. A.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. M.
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Erin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County Schools
Represented By: Richard Scott Boothby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?