Parsons v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Plaintiff: Debbie Parsons
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00124
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Debbie Parsons. (Danaher, Maria) (Modified on 4/11/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/15/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/22/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 p.m. on 4/30/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 5/6/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/14/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (taq)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Danaher, Maria)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Danaher, Maria)
February 21, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7081586. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Maria Greco Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Parsons
Represented By: David L. Grubb
Represented By: Kristina Thomas Whiteaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?