Johnson v. Parkersburg Police Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Christopher Johnson
Defendant: Parkersburg Police Dept., J.M. Stalnaker, Lt. William G. Collins, Patrolman 1st Clas Mike Bosley, Lt. Detective Gregory D. Nangle and T.P. Wolfe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00342
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Partial Filing Fee Received: $23.60, Receipt Number CHAR016091. (ts)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Partial Filing Fee Received: $10, Receipt Number CHAR015983. (tmr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for Mike Bosley, William G. Collins, Gregory D. Nangle, Parkersburg Police Dept., J.M. Stalnaker, T.P. Wolfe, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copies delivered to US Marshal Service for service. (Attachment: #1 US Marshal Form 285) (lca)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE directing that the plaintiff shall pay the full amount of the filing fee of $350.00 by payments sent to the Clerk of the Court by the prison where the plaintiff is incarcerated; no initial partial filing fee is imposed; the plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income credited to his prisoner account, until he has paid the total filing fee of $350.00; granting the #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as more fully set forth herein; the Clerk is directed to issue summonses for the defendants and to deliver the same to the United States Marshals Service; directing that the United States Marshals Service shall serve the summons and a copy of the Complaint on those defendants pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 5/13/2019. (cc: plaintiff, inmate accounts at FCI Gilmer) (lca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 FBOP INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Paul Christopher Johnson in response to #6 Notice of Deficient Pleading. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (mek)
April 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the West Virginia Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00160. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/30/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Paul Christopher Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Paul Christopher Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Christopher Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Christopher Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Notice of Deficient Pleading, #3 Envelope)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Parkersburg Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkersburg Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Stalnaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. William G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrolman 1st Clas Mike Bosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Detective Gregory D. Nangle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.P. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?