Ross v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Joseph H. Ross
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company, Christina Moran, Prudential Insurance Company of America, Lisa Maloney and Renelyn Marie D. Burguete
Case Number: 2:2019cv00358
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY by Joseph H. Ross to #9 Response In Opposition. (Kesner, Brent)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Renelyn Marie D. Burguete, Lisa Maloney, Christina Moran, Pruco Life Insurance Company, Prudential Insurance Company of America to #6 MOTION by Joseph H. Ross to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Raupp, Peter)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 7/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 7/15/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 7/22/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 7/26/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order - 7/31/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Joseph H. Ross in support of #6 MOTION by Joseph H. Ross to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Kesner, Brent)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Joseph H. Ross to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Kesner, Brent)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Renelyn Marie D. Burguete, Lisa Maloney, Christina Moran, Pruco Life Insurance Company, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 5/17/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
May 14, 2019 SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Prudential Insurance Company of America to 5/17/2019. (kew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to 5/17/2019 by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Joseph H. Ross. (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 5/15/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (kew).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Raupp, Peter)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek)
May 6, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ellis
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Zachary Balasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Moran
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ellis
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Zachary Balasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ellis
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Zachary Balasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Maloney
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ellis
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Zachary Balasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renelyn Marie D. Burguete
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ellis
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Zachary Balasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H. Ross
Represented By: Robert V. Berthold, Jr.
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Represented By: Ernest G. Hentschel, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?