Branch Banking and Trust Company v. ServisFirst Bank et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Green Capital Funding, LLC, MBH HIghland, LLC, ServisFirst Bank, World Global Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC and World Global Capital, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00366
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE by ServisFirst Bank in opposition to #25 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Realign Parties (George, Shawn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME re: #23 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Stay Discovery, #25 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Realign Parties to July 12, 2019 by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Creta, Chelsea)
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE by MBH Highland, LLC in opposition to #26 Memorandum In Support, #25 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Realign Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Jacobs, Bruce)
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE by MBH Highland, LLC in opposition to #24 Memorandum In Support, #23 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Bruce)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE by ServisFirst Bank in opposition to #23 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Stay Discovery (George, Shawn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to #30 Response In Opposition. (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC in support of #32 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss #18 Crossclaim or Alternatively Transfer Venue. (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss #18 Crossclaim or Alternatively Transfer Venue. (Burrus, Maigreade) (Modified on 7/1/2019 to add link to #18 crossclaim) (kew).
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY by MBH Highland, LLC to #29 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Bruce)
June 21, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Branch Banking and Trust Company in opposition to #12 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or Alternatively Transfer Venue of Interpleader Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Basdekis, Vivian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC in opposition to #13 MOTION by MBH Highland, LLC to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Burrus, Maigreade) (Modified on 6/21/2019 to remove link to #14 memorandum) (kew).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference previously scheduled is cancelled and the case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 7/26/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/8/2019. Discovery to close 11/22/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/23/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/23/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/8/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/12/2019. Responses due by 12/26/2019. Replies due by 1/2/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 2/12/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/19/2020, with responses due by 2/26/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 2/17/2020. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 3/25/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 3/30/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 3/31/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to #20 Response In Opposition. (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC in support of #25 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Realign Parties (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Realign Parties (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC in support of #23 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Stay Discovery (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Stay Discovery (Burrus, Maigreade)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Branch Banking and Trust Company, ServisFirst Bank, MBH Highland, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC, Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC. (Basdekis, Vivian) (Modified on 6/20/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by ServisFirst Bank in opposition to #12 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or Alternatively Transfer Venue of Interpleader Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(George, Shawn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by MBH Highland, LLC in opposition to #11 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss #3 Crossclaim or Alternatively Transfer Venue. (Macia, Alexander)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO #12 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or Alternatively Transfer Venue of Interpleader Complaint by Branch Banking and Trust Company, World Global Capital, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC (Basdekis, Vivian) (Modified on 6/14/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ServisFirst Bank and CROSSCLAIM by ServisFirst Bank against Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC. (George, Shawn) (Modified on 6/10/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Joinder by ServisFirst Bank re: #13 MOTION by MBH Highland, LLC to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (George, Shawn) (Modified on 6/10/2019 to remove link to #14 memorandum) (kew).
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant ServisFirst Bank (George, Shawn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn P. George on behalf of ServisFirst Bank. (George, Shawn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by MBH Highland, LLC in support of #13 MOTION by MBH Highland, LLC to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Macia, Alexander)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by MBH Highland, LLC to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Macia, Alexander)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or Alternatively Transfer Venue of Interpleader Complaint. (Burrus, Maigreade)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss #3 Crossclaim or Alternatively Transfer Venue. (Burrus, Maigreade) (Modified on 5/30/2019 to correct link) (kew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC in support of #11 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss #3 Crossclaim or Alternatively Transfer Venue. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Burrus, Maigreade) (Modified on 5/28/2019 to add link to #3 crossclaim) (kew) (Modified on 5/30/2019 to replace replace image for document title error and convert event to memorandum of law) (ts).
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC in support of #12 MOTION by Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC, World Global Capital, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or Alternatively Transfer Venue of Interpleader Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Burrus, Maigreade) (Modified on 5/28/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew) (Modified on 5/30/2019 to replace image for document title error and to convert event to memorandum of law) (ts).
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant MBH Highland, LLC (Simon, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Branch Banking and Trust Company (Basdekis, Vivian)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Kevin Barrett on behalf of Green Capital Funding, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC. Local counsel: Maggie Burrus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # CWVSDC-7235748. (Burrus, Maigreade)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL and #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/9/2019 as to ServisFirst Bank. (ts)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/3/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/12/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/19/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 6/26/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/3/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/13/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant MBH Highland, LLC and CROSSCLAIM against Defendants World Global Capital, LLC, Green Capital Funding, LLC and MCA Recovery LLC; with jury demand. (filed with the Notice of Removal on 5/8/2019 and previously filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County on 4/16/2019) (taq)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by World Global Capital Funding, LLC, Green Capital Funding, LLC, MCA Recovery LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7222572. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. ServisFirst Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Vivian H. Basdekis
Represented By: Chelsea A. Creta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Maigreade Bridget Burrus
Represented By: Kevin Wallace Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBH HIghland, LLC
Represented By: Bruce M. Jacobs
Represented By: James Simon
Represented By: Alexander Macia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServisFirst Bank
Represented By: Shawn P. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Global Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Maigreade Bridget Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCA Recovery LLC
Represented By: Maigreade Bridget Burrus
Represented By: Kevin Wallace Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Global Capital, LLC
Represented By: Maigreade Bridget Burrus
Represented By: Kevin Wallace Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?