Radcliff v. Saul
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Radcliff
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00399
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Complaint be filed on or before 8/26/2019; Plaintiff is notified that failure to file a Brief may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/25/2019. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record) (ts)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 006 Non Disability Related Development, #6 007 Disability Related Development, #7 008 Medical Records Part 1, #8 009 Medical Records Part 2)(Neil, Gregory)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint by Andrew Saul.(Neil, Gregory)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE: Replaced defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Social Security Commissioner with Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and updated case title. (mwk) (ADI)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Daniel Joseph Radcliff for service upon Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Person Served: Michelle R. Wallace. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 6/3/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 5/31/2019. (Dils, Jan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Daniel Joseph Radcliff to the Court's #6 Order. (Dils, Jan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Counsel to file with the Court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Kropac is or is not involved in this matter; should Dr. Kropac be involved, the undersigned will direct that the Clerk rotate this matter to another Magistrate Judge in the District; Counsel is directed to file said pleading no later than 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/28/2019. (cc: counsel of record; parties acting pro se) (kew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS The #1 APPLICATION by Daniel Joseph Radcliff to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to issue the summons(es); the Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/28/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
May 22, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mek)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Daniel Joseph Radcliff to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (mek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radcliff v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Represented By: Gregory P. Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Radcliff
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?