Moore v. Saul
Plaintiff: Eddie D. Moore
Defendant: Alex Azar, II and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00404
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 NOTICE: Replaced defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Social Security Commissioner with Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and updated case title. (mwk) (ADI)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Replaced incorrect image with correct image. (lca)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca) (Modified on 6/4/2019 to replace incorrect document with correct document) (lca).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES directing that the #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is granted; the Clerk shall issue the summonses; the plaintiff shall serve the summonses and Complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/4/2019. (cc: attys) (lca)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
May 23, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Eddie D. Moore to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie D. Moore
Represented By: Wendle D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar, II
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?