Moss v. Erie Ins.
Plaintiff: Diana Moss
Defendant: Erie Ins.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00409
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Erie Ins. (Smith, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/11/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/18/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 7/25/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/1/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Erie Ins. (Smith, Andrew) (Modified on 5/30/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
May 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (ts)
May 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca) (Modified on 5/28/2019 to modify judge referral type) (ts).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Erie Ins. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7251744. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Erie Ins.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Ins.
Represented By: Andrew P. Smith
Represented By: Michelle E. Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?