Dilliner et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Tracie Dilliner and Logan James Dilliner
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00415
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/21/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/28/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 9/11/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/16/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC. (Bird, Melissa) (Modified on 7/18/2019 to add jury demand) (kew).
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for an extension of time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint 7/17/2019 by General Motors, LLC, Tracie Dilliner, Logan James Dilliner. (Bird, Melissa) (Modified on 7/3/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY for David A. Brose on behalf of Tracie Dilliner, Logan James Dilliner. Local counsel: Christopher J. Heavens. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7265841. (Heavens, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7257100. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons as to General Motors, LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilliner et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Michael Drury Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Dilliner
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Represented By: David A. Brose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan James Dilliner
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Represented By: David A. Brose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?