Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC v. Brenemen et al
Plaintiff: Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC
Defendant: Tom Louisos, John Brenemen and Denise Scalph
Case Number: 2:2019cv00433
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC in opposition to #13 RULE 12 MOTION by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph #8 First Amended Complaint (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ritchie, Jonathan)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/13/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/23/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/30/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM on 9/6/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/13/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/25/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph in support of #13 RULE 12 MOTION by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph #8 First Amended Complaint. (kew)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 RULE 12 MOTION by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph #8 First Amended Complaint. ERROR: Memorandum in support attached to motion. CORRECTION: Memorandum removed and filed at entry #14. (kew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 12 MOTION by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph #8 First Amended Complaint. (Callaghan, Michael) (Modified on 7/17/2019 to remove memorandum in support attached to motion and file at entry #14 and to convert event to motion to dismiss) (kew).
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC to Withdraw #4 RENEWED MOTION by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC for Preliminary Injunction (Ritchie, Jonathan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing that plaintiff file a reply to defendants' #7 Response by 7/19/2019 and denying as moot without prejudice #5 MOTION to Dismiss to the refiling of a Rule 12 motion pertaining to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that the motion to intervene filed in state court is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph in opposition to Joint Motion to Intervene Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Callaghan, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC against John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (ts)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph in opposition to #4 RENEWED MOTION by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC for Preliminary Injunction (Callaghan, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph in support of #5 RULE 12 MOTION by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph to Dismiss Complaint. (Callaghan, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 12 MOTION by John Brenemen, Tom Louisos, Denise Scalph to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Callaghan, Michael) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 RENEWED MOTION by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC for Preliminary Injunction and Integrated Memorandum of Law (Ritchie, Jonathan)
June 6, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Cases by Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC (Ritchie, Jonathan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Denise Scalph, Tom Louisos, John Brenemen with summons, complaint, docket sheet, motions and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Fayette County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7269295. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC v. Brenemen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Louisos
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brenemen
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Scalph
Represented By: Michael O. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Maple Eagle Coal, LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Larkin
Represented By: Jonathan Zak Ritchie
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Represented By: Andrew C. Robey
Represented By: V. Brandon McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?