Nighbert Land Company v. Consol of Kentucky, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nighbert Land Company
Defendant: Southeastern Land, LLC and Consol of Kentucky, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00435
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 7/22/2019 is CANCELED; directing this case proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 9/20/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/17/2019, and all depositions by 1/31/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/27/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/28/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/8/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/20/2020, with responses due by 3/5/2020, and replies due by 3/12/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 4/22/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/29/2020, with responses due by 5/6/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 4/27/2020 and Integrated Pretrial Order by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2020 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Jury Instructions and Voir Dire by 6/16/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 6/10/2020 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Consol of Kentucky, LLC, Southeastern Land, LLC, Nighbert Land Company. (Pizzo, John) (Modified on 7/16/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Meredith Lee Norman on behalf of Southeastern Land, LLC. Local counsel: Jared M. Tully. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7289380. (Tully, Jared)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southeastern Land, LLC. (Tully, Jared)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Consol of Kentucky, LLC. (Pizzo, John) (Modified on 6/14/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/8/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/16/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 7/23/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/29/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/10/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 6, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Consol of Kentucky, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7270458. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Consent to Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Docket Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Removal) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nighbert Land Company v. Consol of Kentucky, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nighbert Land Company
Represented By: Owen A. Reynolds
Represented By: Charles F. Bagley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Land, LLC
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consol of Kentucky, LLC
Represented By: Charles F. Johns
Represented By: John Dominic Pizzo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?