Blankenship et al v. QBE Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Scot E. Blankenship and Elizabeth A. Blankenship
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00467
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/19/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/26/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 8/30/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/30/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim by Elizabeth A. Blankenship, Scot E. Blankenship. (Giatras, Troy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QBE Insurance Corporation and COUNTERCLAIM by QBE Insurance Corporation against Elizabeth A. Blankenship, Scot E. Blankenship. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Parker, Don)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
June 18, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QBE Insurance Corporation with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Jackson County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7288161. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship et al v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Don C. A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scot E. Blankenship
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Represented By: Matthew Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Blankenship
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Represented By: Matthew Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?