Perry et al v. Hoff
Plaintiff: Meghan Perry and Randy G. Perry
Defendant: Thomas W. Hoff
Not Yet Classified: LM General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00470
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 1/17/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/2/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/3/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 2/18/2020. Discovery to close by 3/2/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 3/23/2020, with Responses due by 4/6/2020, and Replies due by 4/13/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 5/26/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/1/2020, with responses due by 6/8/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/27/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 7/6/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 7/13/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 7/14/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL the parties have agreed to a protocol governing the taking of depositions in this case; directing as more fully set forth that the following protocol shall be followed with all depositions conducted herein. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kew)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting. ERROR: Report did not contain signatures for counsel. CORRECTION: Signatures added and image replaced. (kew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER Order Setting Deposition Protocol by Meghan Perry, Randy G. Perry (Jones, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Meghan Perry, Randy G. Perry, Thomas W. Hoff, LM General Insurance Company. (Jones, Jeffrey) (Modified on 7/26/2019 to add signatures and replace image and to add party filers) (kew).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, David) (Modified on 7/12/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/22/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/31/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/7/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 8/23/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/30/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/6/2019 Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Thomas W. Hoff. (Morrison, Brian) (Modified on 6/27/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kew).
June 21, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thomas W. Hoff with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Logan County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7293195. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Hoff
Represented By: Brian D. Morrison
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: Ashley Taylor Wentz
Represented By: Ashley T. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Perry
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Jones
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy G. Perry
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Jones
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: David P. Cook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?