Gladney v. Campbell
Plaintiff: Ronnie Gladney
Defendant: Jeffery Campbell and Madison Campbell
Not Yet Classified: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00500
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Andrew F. Workman, Esq. on 08/13/19. Madison Campbell waiver mailed on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Tiano, William)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/27/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/6/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/13/2019. Scheduling Conference at 03:30 PM on 9/20/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/27/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (mms)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Fowler, Christopher C. Ross on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America and ANSWER TO #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Fowler, Stephen) (Modified on 8/7/2019 to add jury demand) (kew).
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madison Campbell, re: #6 Amended Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Ronnie Gladney for Madison Campbell, re: #6 Amended Complaint. (Tiano, William) (Modified on 7/25/2019 to add link to #6 amended complaint) (kew).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ronnie Gladney against Madison Campbell. (kew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Jeffery Campbell. Jeffery Campbell served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Summons served on Jeffery Campbell. (Tiano, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/12/2019 as to Safeco Insurance Company of America as Underinsured Carrier for Ronnie Gladney. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002550728. (ts)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffery Campbell, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Safeco Insurance Company of America) (kew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7310585. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to Jeffery Campbell, #2 Summons submitted as to Safeco Insurance Company of America, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gladney v. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Gladney
Represented By: William M. Tiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephen M. Fowler
Represented By: Christopher C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?