Teeters v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Paige Teeters
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00526
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Brooklyn Paige Teeters for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Person Served: Vicky Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 7/24/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 7/22/2019. (Dils, Jan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Brooklyn Paige Teeters to the Court's #6 Order,. (Dils, Jan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Counsel to file with the Court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Kropac is or is not involved in this matter; should Dr. Kropac be involved, the undersigned will direct that the Clerk rotate this matter to another Magistrate Judge in the District; Counsel is directed to file said pleading no later than 8/01/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (ts)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (ts) (Modified on 7/18/2019 to replace image)(ts).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting #1 APPLICATION by Brooklyn Paige Teeters to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; the applicant is hereby permitted to proceed without prepayment of costs of fees or the necessity of giving security therefor; directing the Clerk to issue the summons; Plaintiff shall serve the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (ts)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 17, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Brooklyn Paige Teeters to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teeters v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Paige Teeters
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?