Wriston v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lisa Jo Wriston
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00530
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 006 Non Disability Related Development, #6 007 Disability Related Development, #7 008 Medical Records Part 1, #8 008 Medical Records Part 2)(Neil, Gregory)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint by Andrew Saul.(Neil, Gregory)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lisa Jo Wriston for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Person Served: Vicky Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 7/29/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 7/26/2019. (Dils, Jan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mms)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES The #1 APPLICATION by Lisa Jo Wriston to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is GRANTED; the plaintiff is hereby permitted to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees or the necessity of giving security therefor; directing the Clerk of the Court to issue the summonses; plaintiff shall serve the summonses and Complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against the plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and her attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (ts)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 19, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Lisa Jo Wriston to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wriston v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Represented By: Gregory P. Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jo Wriston
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?