So. Park Limited Liability Company et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: So. Park Limited Liability Company and Lawrence A. Pack
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00532
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME to answer or respond to #1 Petition for Readjustment of Partnership Items to 10/17/2019 by United States of America, So. Park Limited Liability Company, Lawrence A. Pack. (Bishop, Kyle) (Modified on 9/12/2019 to add link to #1 petition and to add party filers) (kew).
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Asst. Attorney General for Administration, Justice Management Division. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hoblitzell, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Lamar Bishop on behalf of United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. United States of America served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Hoblitzell, John) (Modified on 7/29/2019 to remove link to #3 summons and to update answer deadline) (kew).
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Petition. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Internal Revenue Service, #2 U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of West Virginia) (mms)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
July 19, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR READJUSTMENT OF PARTNERSHIP ITEMS. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7324905. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney General, #5 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney for So. District WV, #6 Proposed Summons as to Internal Revenue Service) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: So. Park Limited Liability Company et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: So. Park Limited Liability Company
Represented By: John D. Hoblitzell, III
Represented By: Craig M. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence A. Pack
Represented By: John D. Hoblitzell, III
Represented By: Craig M. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?