Hughes v. FBI et al
Plaintiff: Terry Hughes
Defendant: FBI and DEA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00550
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER to Terry Hughes, from Clerk of Court dated 9/16/2019, re: status of financial waiver. (kew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from Terry Hughes dated 9/8/2019, re: status of financial affidavit. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Terry Hughes dated 8/19/2019 requesting subpoena forms and enclosing documentation. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (ts)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Terry Hughes to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Resident Transaction Details) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (ts)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Terry Hughes for Appointment of Counsel and ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION in support of #1 Letter-Form Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (kew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. FBI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?