Stierwalt et al v. Best Logistics Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Stierwalt and William Stierwalt
Defendant: Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC and Best Logistics Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00552
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY by Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC to #21 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Flanagan, J.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Amy Stierwalt, William Stierwalt in support of #21 Objection. (Ranson, J.) (Modified on 9/4/2019 to correct link and to convert event to memorandum in support) (kew).
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTION by Amy Stierwalt, William Stierwalt in opposition to #18 MOTION by Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC to Set Aside Default and for Leave to File an Answer to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 7a, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Ranson, J.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN RECEIPT CARDS received re: #16 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt for Best Services Group, Inc., #2 Return Receipt for H & W Holdings, LLC) (kew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC in support of #18 MOTION by Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC to Set Aside Default and for Leave to File an Answer to #1 Complaint. (Flanagan, J.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC to Set Aside Default and for Leave to File an Answer to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Flanagan, J.) (Modified on 8/28/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Justice Tucker, J. Victor Flanagan on behalf of Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC. (Tucker, Ashley)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC. (cc: counsel of record; defendants) (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (kew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re: #1 Complaint, as to H & W Holdings, LLC; answer due 8/26/2019. (ts)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re: #1 Complaint, as to Best Logistics Group, Inc.; answer due 8/26/2019. (ts)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by William Stierwalt, Amy Stierwalt for Entry of Default by Clerk against H & W Holdings, LLC (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by William Stierwalt, Amy Stierwalt for Entry of Default by Clerk against Best Services Group, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by William Stierwalt, Amy Stierwalt for Entry of Default by Clerk against Best Logistics Group, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Ranson, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by William Stierwalt, Amy Stierwalt for Default Judgment against H & W Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ranson, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by William Stierwalt, Amy Stierwalt for Default Judgment against Best Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ranson, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by William Stierwalt, Amy Stierwalt for Default Judgment against Best Logistics Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ranson, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/29/2019 as to H & W Holdings, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002558557. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope) (kew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/29/2019 as to H & W Holdings, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002558564. (kew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/29/2019 as to Best Logistics Group, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002558571. (kew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/29/2019 as to Best Services Group, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002558588. (kew)
July 26, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Best Logistics Group, Inc., Best Services Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Best Services Group, Inc., #2 Summons as to H & W Holdings, LLC, #3 Summons as to H & W Holdings, LLC) (kew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7331419. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Summons as to Best Logistics Group, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Best Services Group, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons as to H & W Holdings, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons as to H & W Holdings, LLC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stierwalt et al v. Best Logistics Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Justice Tucker
Represented By: J. Victor Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & W Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Justice Tucker
Represented By: J. Victor Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Logistics Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Justice Tucker
Represented By: J. Victor Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Stierwalt
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stierwalt
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?