Bower v. Coal-Mac LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Bower
Defendant: Coal-Mac LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00560
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/7/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/28/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 11/1/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/6/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mms)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Coal-Mac LLC of #6 Notice of Intention to Serve Subpoena. (Hill, Cy) (Modified on 9/11/2019 to add link to #6 notice) (kew).
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Intention to Serve Subpoena by Coal-Mac LLC (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Hill, Cy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Cy A. Hill, Ashley W. French assuming responsibility for the defense of the Defendant, Coal-Mac, LLC, in place of Jeffrey K. Phillips and Jonathan R. Ellis. (Hill, Cy) M
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coal-Mac LLC. (Phillips, Jeffrey) (Modified on 8/7/2019 to add link to #2 notice of removal) (kew).
July 31, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coal-Mac LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Logan County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7335969. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Coal-Mac LLC (Phillips, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower v. Coal-Mac LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bower
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: D. Blake Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Paul R. Thomson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coal-Mac LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Phillips
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ellis
Represented By: Ashley W. French
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?