Blankenship v. Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Don Blankenship
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive and Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00589
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Don Blankenship, Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Gray, Jeremy) (Modified on 9/20/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jeremy Gray on behalf of Don Blankenship. Local counsel: Jeffrey S. Simpkins. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7371955. (Simpkins, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/16/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/23/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 9/27/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/7/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC (Hendrickson, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Hendrickson, David)
August 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. ERROR: Filing did not include Civil Cover Sheet. CORRECTION: Civil Cover Sheet added to entry. (ts)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #CHAR016233. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts) (Modified on 8/12/2019 to add attachment #2)(ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Blankenship
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Simpkins
Represented By: Jeremy Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?