R. E. et al v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: P. K. E. and R. E.
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc. and Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00591
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JPML DETERMINATION by JUUL Labs, Inc. re: #7 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Laurie)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION by JUUL Labs, Inc. to Stay Proceedings Pending JMDL Determination; this case is STAYED pending a determination from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and further order of this Court; Counsel are DIRECTED to notify this Court when the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a ruling on the Motion to Transfer this case; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove this case from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION by JUUL Labs, Inc. to Stay Proceedings Pending JMDL Determination. (Hurney, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. (Hurney, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE (COPY) OF RELATED CASES by JUUL Labs, Inc. filed with the United States Judicial Panel on Mutlidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Part 1, #2 Exhibits - Part 2, #3 Exhibits - Part 3, #4 Exhibits - Part 4, #5 Exhibits - Part 5, #6 Exhibits - Part 6) (ts)
August 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., and Philip Morris USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 as to Juul Labs, Inc., #2 as to Philip Morris USA, Inc.) (mms)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7348188. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. E. et al v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Hurney, Jr.
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. K. E.
Represented By: C. Benjamin Salango
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Represented By: Brett Justice Preston
Represented By: Dan R. Snuffer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. E.
Represented By: C. Benjamin Salango
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Represented By: Brett Justice Preston
Represented By: Dan R. Snuffer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?