Dials v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Appellant: Timothy Hugh Dials
Trustee: Thomas H. Fluharty and United States Trustee
Appellee: Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC, Christopher Dawson and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00601
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Referring Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER: For reasons appearing to the court, this case is reassigned from Judge Thomas E. Johnston to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 9/24/2019.(cc: Judge Johnston; Judge Goodwin; counsel of record; unrepresented parties) (klc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 1 volume. (mkw)
August 15, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Timothy Hugh Dials to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (mkw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL AND TRANSMITTAL by Timothy Hugh Dials; appeal from USBC/SDWV from the Order entered 08/09/2019 entitled: Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #2 Clerk's Service of Amended Notice of Appeal, and Notice to Designate the Record and Provide Statement of Issues on Appeal, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Transmittal Sheet) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dials v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Timothy Hugh Dials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas H. Fluharty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC
Represented By: Gregory A. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher Dawson
Represented By: Gregory A. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?