Parsons et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roderick D. Parsons, Chelsea R. Miller, Pamela Doss, Annettea S. Fields, Belinda Cunningham, James D. Miller, David S. Casto, Bruce W. Cunningham, Jacob Somerville, Brenda L. Hunt, Kay M. Greathouse, Joseph Cunningham, Jerry E. Cunningham and Charles B. Hunt
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00649
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company in support of #15 PARTIAL MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (Burt, Stefanie)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 PARTIAL MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Burt, Stefanie) (Modified on 11/4/2019 to add link to #2 complaint) (kew).
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company (Burt, Stefanie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Philip D. Sever on behalf of Roderick D. Parsons. Local counsel: James P. McHugh. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7407907. (McHugh, James)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE directing that the #11 Joint Motion to Amend #7 Order and Notice is GRANTED and that the dates and deadlines are EXTENDED as follows: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/15/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/22/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 12/2/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/6/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/8/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company, Roderick D. Parsons, Charles B. Hunt, Brenda L. Hunt, Jerry E. Cunningham, Belinda Cunningham, Chelsea R. Miller, James D. Miller, Bruce W. Cunningham, Joseph Cunningham, Annettea S. Fields, Kay M. Greathouse, David S. Casto, Jacob Somerville, Pamela Doss to Amend #7 Order and Notice. (Burt, Stefanie) (Modified on 10/8/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY for Tonny D. Storey on behalf of Roderick D. Parsons. Local counsel: James P. McHugh. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7404229. (McHugh, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stefanie Lepore Burt on behalf of Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company. (Burt, Stefanie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicolle S. Bagnell on behalf of Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/7/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/28/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 11/1/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/6/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mms)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/12/2019 as to Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002584877. (kew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/12/2019 as to Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002584884. (kew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company, re: #2 Class Action Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company) (kew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7378105. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Roderick D. Parsons, Charles B. Hunt, Brenda L. Hunt, Jerry E. Cunningham, Belinda Cunningham, Chelsea R. Miller, James D. Miller, Bruce W. Cunningham, Joseph Cunningham, Annettea S. Fields, Kay M. Greathouse, David S. Casto, Jacob Somerville, Pamela Doss for Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company re: #2 Complaint. (McHugh, James) (Modified on 9/11/2019 to add link to #2 complaint and to add party filers) (kew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick D. Parsons
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Philip D. Sever
Represented By: Tonny D. Storey
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea R. Miller
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Doss
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annettea S. Fields
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Cunningham
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Miller
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Casto
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce W. Cunningham
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Somerville
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Hunt
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay M. Greathouse
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cunningham
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Cunningham
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B. Hunt
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Robert D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Nicolle S. Bagnell
Represented By: Stefanie Lepore Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company
Represented By: Nicolle S. Bagnell
Represented By: Stefanie Lepore Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?