McClung et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R. McClung, Jr. and Joyce Lynn Bobrycki McClung
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 25-50, IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners, Boeing Company, 3M Company, Goodrich Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Honeywell International Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-25, Northtrup-Gruman Corporation, CBS Corp. and McDonnell Douglas Corporation
Interested Party: Scott Segal
Case Number: 2:2019cv00695
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 175 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the New Jersey; Case Number 2:16-cv-02301. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER; adopting Judge Mannion's recommendations in the GE R&R D.E. #147 and Boeing R&R (D.E. No. 148), modifying the R&Rs analyses to comport with the Court's analysis in the accompanying Opinion; Plaintiff's Objections (D.E. Nos. 150 & 151) are DENIED; General Electric Companys motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (D.E. No. 35) is DENIED, but the claims against General Electric Company are SEVERED and are TRANSFERED to the Southern District of West Virginia; Boeing Company's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (D.E. No. 53) is DENIED, but the claims against Boeing Company are SEVERED and are TRANSFERED to the District of Delaware; and the Clerk of Court TERMINATE docket entry numbers 147,148,150 and 151; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/25/2019. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 173 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/25/2019. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff, Goodrich, and IMO shall meet and confer to determine if they have a discovery dispute. If there is, confer to resolve and if they cannot resolve, file a joint dispute letter within 14 days. A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 11/18/2019 at 10:45 a.m. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/24/19. (Mannion, Steven) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TEXT ORDER -- A telephone conference is scheduled for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 Am Defendant(s) CBS counsel shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/27/2019. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2019. text order to be entered scheduling next conference for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 7/18/2019. Text Order entered scheduling next conference for 8/16/2019 at 9:15 AM (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 TEXT ORDER: After counsel receive a decision on D.E. 150, 151 they should confer and file a joint agenda letter in advance of the next conference. A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 8/16/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Defendant(s)' CBS counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/18/19. (Mannion, Steven) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 169 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney TERENCE W. CAMP and DAVID J. NOVACK terminated. Attorney TERENCE W. CAMP for GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY,TERENCE W. CAMP for GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY,TERENCE W. CAMP for GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY,TERENCE W. CAMP for GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY,TERENCE W. CAMP for GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY added.. (CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 TEXT ORDER -- A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 7/18/2019 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/31/2019. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 5/30/2019. Text Order to be entered scheduling next conference for 7/18/2019 at 5 PM (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TEXT ORDER -- A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 5/30/2019 at 4:15 p.m. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 3/19/2019. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 3/18/2019. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2019. Text Order entered scheduling next conference for 3/18/2019 at 2:00 PM (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 3/18/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant(s)' Honeywells counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/14/19. (Mannion, Steven) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 LETTER ORDER: In accordance with my Report and Recommendation, and for the purposes of discovery until the Court rules on Plaintiffs pending appeal, Boeing shall be treated as a non-party and the parties discovery with regard to Boeing shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/20/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 164 Joint Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey and Dennis Geier, Esq. (GAFFREY, MARC) Modified on 12/11/2018 (sms). [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 11/28/2018. text order entered scheduling next conference for 1/14/2019 at 2:45 pm (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff and Boeing shall meet and confer and file a joint dispute letter (along with any briefs) within 14 days re: whether Boeing will participate in discovery voluntarily as a party or involuntarily as a non-party by subpoena. A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 1/14/2019 at 2:45 p.m. Defendant(s)' GEs counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/28/18. (Mannion, Steven) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ORDER -- A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 11/28/2018 at 11:30 a.m. Defendant(s)' Goodyears counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/20/2018. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2018. text order to be entered scheduling next conference for 11/28/18 at 11:30 am (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 161 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER, granting letter request re #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG ( Motion reset for 9/17/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court.). Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 08/23/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 159 Letter from Dennis Geier, Esq. re #158 Defendant's Response Brief, #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 158 Defendant's Response Brief by BOEING COMPANY(individually and as successor to ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 157 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #150 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #147 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 156 RESPONSE to Motion filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 2, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The RESPONSE to Motion docket entry #154 , Certificate of Service page 4, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER, granting #153 Letter requesting a one week extension for filing of Defendant, The Bowing Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's filed Objections of Judge Mannion's Report and Recommendation entered July 6, 2018; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 07/31/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #150 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #147 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG, #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG. Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 154 RESPONSE to Motion filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #150 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #147 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG, #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 153 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 152 Letter from Dennis Geier, Esq. re #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit P)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Dennis Geier, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 150 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #147 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Dennis Geier, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 149 Transcript of Hearing held on May 3, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 8/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (jml) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG Objections, if any, to R&R due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 07/05/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 147 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Amended Complaint, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG Objections, if any, to R&R due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 07/05/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 7/5/2018. text order entered scheduling next conference for 9/17/2018 at 11:30 am (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 9/17/2018 at 11:30 a.m. Defendant(s)' CBS counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/5/18. (Mannion, Steven) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 TEXT ORDER -- A telephone conference is scheduled with Magistrate Judge Mannion on 7/5/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/8/2018. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 5/3/2018. text order to be entered scheduling next conference for 7/5/2018 at 10:00 a.m. (ECR) (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER RE: Discovery; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/16/18. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 143 Letter from Plaintiff and Boeing. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #140 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 142 Letter from David S. Blow re #141 Letter, #139 Letter. (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 141 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey re #139 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. v. Superior Court of California San Fransisco, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Edward Zarek in Support of Boeing's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit Joseph McClung Jr.'s Vol I Relevant Pages, #4 Exhibit Lasala v. Marfin Popular Bank Public Co. Ltd.)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 140 Application/Motion for Pro Bono Counsel by BOEING COMPANY(individually and as successor to ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. v. Superior Court of California San Fransisco, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Edward Zarek in Support of Boeing's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit Joseph McClung Jr.'s Vol I Relevant Pages, #4 Exhibit Lasala v. Marfin Popular Bank Public Co. Ltd.)(GAFFREY, MARC) Modified on 3/20/2018 (ek). [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 139 Letter from Dennis Geier. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 138 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey, Esq.. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 TEXT ORDER: As discussed on 2/28/18, Defendant General Electric shall rely on its prior papers in support of its informal motion challenging personal jurisdiction and requesting transfer. (DE 136). Defendant Boeing shall also so advise. Plaintiff shall file opposition within 7 days. Replies are due within 7 days of opposition. Once the informal motion is fully briefed, counsel shall restart settlement discussions and advise the Court if any parties or claims can be dismissed on consent. Otherwise, telephone oral argument is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 5/3/2018 at 2:00 P.M. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 3/5/18. (Mannion, Steven) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 136 Letter from David Speziali. (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2018. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC SCOTT GAFFREY on behalf of BOEING COMPANY(individually and as successor to ) (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/22/18. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER VACATING #104 Opinion and Order, and TERMINATING #107 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 2/21/2018. (sr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER TERMINATING #106 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court, and VACATING #103 Opinion and Order; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 2/21/2018. (sr). [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 131 Letter from Dennis Geier re #130 Letter. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 130 Letter from Dennis Geier. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 129 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 128 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey. (Attachments: #1 Agreed Protective Order)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
January 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 1/2/2018. supplemental scheduling order filed. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/28/2018 at 04:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/2/18. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 11/16/2017. text order entered scheduling next conference for 1/2/18 at 2:00 (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 1/2/2018 at 2:00 P.M. Defendant(s)' IMO counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/16/17. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Agreed Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/25/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 124 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey, Esq.. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 123 Letter from Terence W. Camp, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2017. Amended scheduling order filed. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: scheduling a telephone Status Conference on 11/16/2017 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion, Fact Discovery shall remain open through 2/1/2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/25/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 121 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #119 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer Cree, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/11/17. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BOEING COMPANY(individually and as successor to ). (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer Cree, #2 Certification Marc S. Gaffrey in support of PHV of Jennifer Cree, #3 Certification of Service of Marc S. Gaffrey, #4 Text of Proposed Order for PPHV of Jennifer Cree)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2017. Text order entered scheduling next conference for 9/25/17 at 3 p.m. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 TEXT ORDER: Counsel shall meet and confer re: a discovery confidentiality order and a plan to move forward with document discovery under Rules 34 & 45. A joint plan to be filed by 9/15/17. A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 9/25/2017 at 3:00 P.M. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/22/17. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER defendant 3M Company w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/23/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 116 STIPULATION of Dismissal of 3M Company by 3M COMPANY. (BRUNERMER, CATHERINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2017. Text order entered scheduling next conference for 8/22/2017 10:30 a.m. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 8/22/2017 at 10:30 AM. Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/15/17. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 114 Letter from Marc S. Gaffrey. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 113 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Exhibit V, #5 Exhibit W)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 112 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 111 Letter from Dennis Geier, Esq. re #107 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #104 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 110 Letter from Dennis Geier, Esq. re #106 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #103 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 109 Appellee's BRIEF by BOEING COMPANY(individually and as successor to ). Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Portions of Plaintiff's deposition transcriopt vol 1, #3 Exhibit Portion of Plaintiff's deposition transcriopt vol 2, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Edward Zarek, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Shimamoto)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #106 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #103 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #107 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #104 Order,, #106 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #103 Order,. Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 107 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #104 Order, (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 106 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG re #103 Order, (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 105 Letter from Dennis Geier, Esq.. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 (VACATED see #133 ) OPINION AND ORDER that Defendant Boeing is severed from this action. The Clerk shall transfer this action against Boeing to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, and Defendant Boeing's motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/17/17. (sr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 (VACATED see #132 ) OPINION AND ORDER that Defendant General Electric's request to sever and transfer venue to the Southern District of West Virginia is GRANTED, and that the pending motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. The Clerk shall transfer the action against General Electric to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/17/17. (sr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2017. text order entered scheduling next conference for 6/15/17 at 11:30 a.m. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 6/15/2017 at 11:30 AM. Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/17/17. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 12, 2017 Filing 101 Letter from Dennis Geier, Esq.. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 100 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against 3M COMPANY, BOEING COMPANY, CBS CORP., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-25, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 25-50, NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION by IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners.(FONTAK, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners identifying Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and Imo Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners (FONTAK, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 97 BRIEF -Reply in Support of GE's Supplemental Brief in Response to Court Order at ECF #68 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Portions of Pltf Dep of 6/6/16, #2 Portions of Pltf Dep of 5/10/16)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 96 BRIEF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO GENERAL ELECTRICS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER AT ECF NO. 68 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 95 SUMMONS ON AMENDED CMP. ISSUED as to IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *DONNA DEANGELIS* (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 94 Request for Summons to be Issued by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG as to IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2017. Amended scheduling order to be filed. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER that Plaintiff's opposition papers to D.E. 90 shall be filed by 2/24/2017 and Defendant G.E.s reply, if any shall be filed by 3/3/2017. All other briefing regarding Defendant Boeing is now closed. A telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 4/17/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion, and Fact Discovery shall remain open through 5/1/2017; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/16/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. NOVACK on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (NOVACK, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Filing 91 Letter from T. Camp re: Case Management. (CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 90 BRIEF General Electric Company's Supplemental Brief in accorance with the Court's October 19, 2016 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 10.18.2016 Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Defs 8-K Forms, #3 Exhibit C - McClung, Joseph R. v. 3M Company fled copy of Exhibit I- GE)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER staying all discovery against Boeing until the resolution of Boeing's pending #53 motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/3/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 30, 2016 Filing 88 Letter from Marc Gaffrey, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 12/23/2016. Discovery stayed as to Boeing pending decision on MTD, deft. to submit proposed order (CD #ECR.) (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Gross, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/22/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryan Smith, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/22/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amaryah Bocchino, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/22/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amaryah Bocchino, Esq., #83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan Smith, Esq., #84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Gross, Esq.. Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Gross, Esq. by BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan Smith, Esq. by BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amaryah Bocchino, Esq. by BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 81 AMENDED COMPLAINT Proposed Amended Complaint and Jury Demand against 3M COMPANY, BOEING COMPANY, CBS CORP., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-25, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 25-50, NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION, IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners, filed by JOYCE LYNN BOBRYCKI MCCLUNG.(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 80 STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 78 Letter from Boeing Company - signed version. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 77 Letter from Boeing Company. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 79 Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on November 30, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 12/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2017. (mfr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER administratively terminating #66 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/30/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 2/16/2017 at 10:30 AM. Defendant(s)' CBS counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/30/16. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2016. Order to be filed. (CD #ECR.) (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 74 Letter from counsel for Plaintiff, Boeing and General Electric. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER extending the parties filing deadline for the joint proposal until 11/18/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/16/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 72 Letter from Boeing Company. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings of MOTION HEARING held on October 18, 2016, before Judge STEVEN C. MANNION. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER: The 11/29/16 tele cnf is adjourned to 11/30/2016 at 4:00 P.M. with Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/8/16. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: indicating there shall be a meet and confer telephone conference among all counsel regarding a joint proposal on 11/1/2016 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for defendant Boeing shall initiate the call, scheduling a telephone Status Conference on 11/29/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion, Fact Discovery to remain open through 2/1/2017; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/18/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER administratively terminating #35 Motion to Dismiss ; administratively terminating #53 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and filing of supplemental submissions; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/19/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2016 re #66 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR., #67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #66 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. OTBS (ECR) (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
October 5, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #66 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 28, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #66 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading. Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 27, 2016 Filing 66 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in support of Motion for leave to File Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Amend Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER: Counsel shall appear before Judge Mannion for a status conference in Courtroom 2B on 10/18/2016 at 9:00 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/9/16. (SCM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 9/6/2016, text order entered scheduling status conference for 10/18/2016 09:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
September 1, 2016 Filing 64 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BOEING COMPANY re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 30, 2016 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Reply to Cross Claims against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(individually and as successor to the).(STEIN, ETHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 30, 2016 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 61 STATEMENT (Rule 26 Disclosure) by BOEING COMPANY. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CONSENT ORDER permitting defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. leave to file and serve an answer out of time w/in 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/24/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 23, 2016 Filing 59 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative, Transfer Venue, filed by Boeing (Attachments: #1 Certification in support of opposition, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 23, 2016 Filing 58 Letter from Terence Camp with Proposed Consent Order extending time to file answer. (CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSENT ORDER extending time to answer out of time and within 21 days of the date hereof as to Deft. Honeywell International Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/10/16. (dc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 56 Proposed Consent Order to Answer Out of Time ANSWER to Complaint by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(individually and as successor to the).(STEIN, ETHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 9/6/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 26, 2016 Filing 55 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #35 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Reply, #2 Exhibit B to Reply)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER ORDER directing Defendants' Counsel to refile its reply brief, in accordance with Local Civil Rule 7.2(b), no later than July 21, 2016 re #48 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/14/2016. (seb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 13, 2016 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION(individually and as successor to ).(DESIPIO, ADAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 13, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM A. DESIPIO on behalf of NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION (DESIPIO, ADAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Scheduling Conference held on 7/12/2016. Initial scheduling order filed. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2016 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2016. Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/12/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #35 MOTION to Dismiss or In The Alternative Transfer Venue filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against 3M COMPANY, CBS CORP., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-25, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 25-50, NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION by BOEING COMPANY.(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 46 Joint Discovery Plan by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR.(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 45 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative, Transfer Venue, filed by General Electric (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification in support of Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CONSENT ORDER permitting Defendant leave to file an Answer w/in 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/28/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Filing 43 Consent Order to Answer Out of Time ANSWER to Complaint by BOEING COMPANY.(GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 24, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by ETHAN D. STEIN on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (STEIN, ETHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 21, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/18/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER adjourning #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY to 7/18/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/21/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER -- The Rule 16 conference scheduled for 7/12/16 at 11:30 AM will be held before Judge Mannion in Courtroom 2B of the Martin Luther King, Jr. Courthouse. The parties are to otherwise follow the instructions prescribed by Judge Dickson in the Order at D.E. 24. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/20/2016. (spc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the R16 conference scheduled for 7/12/16 before USMJ Joseph A. Dickson has been cancelled.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/17/16. (nm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 6/16/16. (th, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 14, 2016 Filing 37 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR re #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by General Electric Company (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
June 1, 2016 Filing 36 Letter from Rule 26(a)(1)(A0 Initial Disclosures. (CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/5/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Cert of Counsel, #3 EX A MCCLUNG Video Deposition, #4 EX B Plaintiffs Interrogatory Responses)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Malcolm Brisker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/26/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER ORDER terminating #28 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant shall file all documents related to the motion to dismiss-i.e., memorandum in support, certification, notice of motion-in one docket entry. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/25/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 25, 2016 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY identifying Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co as Corporate Parent.. (CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 18, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SCOTT SEGAL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Scott S. Segal to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/20/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #28 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 EX A MCCLUNG Video Deposition, #2 EX B Plaintiffs Interrogatory Responses)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #28 MOTION to Dismiss (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE W. CAMP on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (CAMP, TERENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEING COMPANY. (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 17, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC SCOTT GAFFREY on behalf of BOEING COMPANY (GAFFREY, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 13, 2016 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/12/2016 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/12/16. (nm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 11, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE by NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(DESIPIO, ADAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 10, 2016 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY identifying General Electric Company as Corporate Parent.. (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 10, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Ex A Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex B State Court Documents)(BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 10, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 10, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOODRICH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEZII, DAWN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 3M COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Catherine E. Brunermer, Esquire, #2 Affidavit of Malcom Brisker, Esquire, #3 Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BRUNERMER, CATHERINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Reply to Cross-claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against BOEING COMPANY, CBS CORP., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-25, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 25-50, NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION by 3M COMPANY.(BRUNERMER, CATHERINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (BRUNERMER, CATHERINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE E. BRUNERMER on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BRUNERMER, CATHERINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORP. identifying CBS Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE on behalf of CBS CORP. (KEALE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW on behalf of CBS CORP. (BLOW, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 4, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW029538 RE: Stephen C. Musilli. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 3, 2016 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION. (DESIPIO, ADAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 3, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW029525 RE: Scott S. Segal. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
May 3, 2016 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Compliance of Scott S. Segal, Esquire by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Scott S. Segal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/28/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Nancy Shane Rappaport. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/28/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Stephen C. Musilli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/27/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. (GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NORTHTRUP-GRUMAN CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam A. DeSipio, #2 Certification of Nancy Shane Rappaport, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DESIPIO, ADAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOSEPH R. MCCLUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Dennis M. Geier, #2 Certification Certification that no brief is required, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C)(GEIER, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 26, 2016 Filing 3 Letter from Jeanine D. Clark. (CLARK, JEANINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 26, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GOODRICH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of counsel, #2 Certification no brief is required, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(DEZII, DAWN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]
April 22, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOEING COMPANY from MIDDLESEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number MID-L-01950-16AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7058610), filed by BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miller, S) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClung et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 25-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, as successor to Adel Fasteners
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: MARC SCOTT GAFFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: CATHERINE E. BRUNERMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: TERENCE W. CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northtrup-Gruman Corporation
Represented By: ADAM A. DESIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonnell Douglas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. McClung, Jr.
Represented By: DENNIS M. GEIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Lynn Bobrycki McClung
Represented By: DENNIS M. GEIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?